WV HB2661 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit a natural gas utility to make a request for proposal for incentivized gas drilling where dependable, lower-priced supplies of natural gas are not readily available. The bill permits a natural gas utility to recover the cost reasonably necessary to convert a customer to an alternate fuel source when gas service to that customer has been abandoned. The bill permits natural gas utilities to recover those costs.
Title
Relating to natural gas utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 438) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 120) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 120) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 438) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 120) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-24 | House | To House Energy |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-24 | House | To Energy |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 3 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |