WV HB2657 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow members of the Livestock Care Standards Board to be reimbursed for expenses consistent with the West Virginia Department of Agriculture Travel Policy and Procedure instead of the guidelines of the Travel Management Office of the Department of Administration.
Title
Allowing members of the Livestock Care Standards Board to be reimbursed for expenses consistent with the West Virginia Department of Agriculture Travel Policy and Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 210) |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-06 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |