WV HB2654 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2654
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand county commissions’ ability to dispose of county or district property; and eliminate the requirement that property conveyed to volunteer fire department or volunteer ambulance service reverts back to county commission following termination of use.
Title
Expanding county commissions’ ability to dispose of county or district property
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tony Lewis [R] | Del. Edward Evans [D] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. John Williams [D] | Del. Jill Upson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 216) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-22 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2654 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - To Government Organization
SB70 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary
SB70 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |