WV HB2648 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Department of Health and Human Resources to promulgate a legislative rule relating to procedures pertaining to the Dangerousness Assessment Advisory Board.This section is new; therefore,
Title
Authorizing certain agencies and boards of the DHHR to promulgate a legislative rule
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 499) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 498) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 360) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 261) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 498) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 360) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 261) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 499) |
2023-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 498) |
2023-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 360) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/2/2023 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 261) |
2023-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 260) |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Similar To) 2023-01-20 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |