WV HB2626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of the Abandoned Land Reclamation Fund
Title
Relating to use of the Abandoned Land Reclamation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 155) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 154) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 155) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 154) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 155) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 154) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-05 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |