WV HB2618 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to include undue influence as a factor in the definition of financial exploitation of an incapacitated person, elderly person or protected person and to correct technical errors. The amendment is made in the civil cause of action as well as the criminal action.
Title
Including undue influence as a factor in the definition of financial exploitation of an elderly person or protected person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 733) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 493) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 493) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 733) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 493) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2019-02-15 | House | Motion that bill be recommitted to Judiciary rejected |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Senior, Children, and Family Issues |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-23 | House | To Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7J | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 29b | Amended Code | Citation Text |