WV HB2602 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2602

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to include possession of known stolen property in the offense of receiving or transferring stolen property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including possession of known stolen property in the offense of receiving or transferring stolen property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 163) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 9) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-13HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-02-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 163)
2020-02-13HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-12SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 132)
2020-02-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-12SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-10SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-10SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-07SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-01-20SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-20SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 9)
2020-01-17HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-16HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-15HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2602 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61318Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback