WV HB2602 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2602
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to include possession of known stolen property in the offense of receiving or transferring stolen property.
Title
Including possession of known stolen property in the offense of receiving or transferring stolen property
Sponsors
Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Nathan Brown [D] |
Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 43) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 43) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |