WV HB2589 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require county boards of education to permit students who are homeschooled or attend private schools to enroll and take classes at the county’s vocational school.
Title
Permitting students who are homeschooled or attend private schools to enroll and take classes at the county’s vocational school
Sponsors
Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] | Del. Anthony Paynter [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 532) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 592) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report (Roll No. 591) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 215) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 592) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report (Roll No. 591) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 215) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-26 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 532) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 592) |
2017-04-08 | House | House adopted conference report (Roll No. 591) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report received-House |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | To conference |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House appointed conferees: Blair, Upson, Rodighiero |
2017-04-08 | House | House agreed to conference |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Gaunch, Mann, Romano |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 215) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-21 | House | To House Education |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-21 | House | To Education |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 21A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 21A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5 | 15g | New Code | See Bill Text |