WV HB2587 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to state what information a receipt for taxes from a sheriff shall contain; and how the information may be provided to the taxpayer.
Title
To reflect that County Sheriffs will be required to include a breakdown of the distribution of where a citizen’s taxes will be paid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/7/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/7/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 166) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11A | 1 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |