WV HB2569 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to establish the Motorsport Responsibility Act; provide legislative findings; define terms; set forth duties of motorsport operators; set forth duties of motorsport participants; set forth the liability of motorsport operators; set forth the liability of motorsport participants; and provide rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Motorsport Responsibility Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 541) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 540) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 52) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseChapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-03-29HouseApproved by Governor 3/29/2023
2023-03-11HouseApproved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateApproved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-20HouseTo Governor 3/20/2023
2023-03-11HouseTo Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2023-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2023-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 541)
2023-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 540)
2023-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2023-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401)
2023-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2023-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-03-06SenateJudiciary committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-06SenateOutdoor Recreation committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2023-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2023-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2023-03-03SenateOn 1st reading
2023-03-02SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2023-02-16SenateTo Judiciary
2023-02-16SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary
2023-02-01SenateTo Outdoor Recreation
2023-02-01SenateTo Outdoor Recreation then Judiciary
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-01-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-01-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 52)
2023-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2023-01-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-01-30HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-01-30HouseRead 2nd time
2023-01-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-01-27HouseRead 1st time
2023-01-27HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-01-26HouseBy substitute, do pass
2023-01-16HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-01-16HouseIntroduced in House
2023-01-16HouseTo Judiciary
2023-01-16HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB236 (Similar To) 2023-01-20 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20191New CodeSee Bill Text
20192New CodeSee Bill Text
20193New CodeSee Bill Text
20194New CodeSee Bill Text
20195New CodeSee Bill Text
20196New CodeSee Bill Text
20197New CodeSee Bill Text
20198New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2569&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2569%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2569
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2569%20sub.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2569
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2569%20sub%20eng.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2569
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2569%20sub%20enr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2569
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb2569%20hfa%20fast%201-26%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb2569%20hfa%20fast%201-26%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20or%20amt%20_1%202-15.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20or%20am%20_1%202-7.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20jud%20am%20_1%202-7.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20jud%20am%20_1%202-7%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20or%20am%20_1%202-7%20withdrawn.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb2569%20s%20or%20amt%20_1%202-15%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00052.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00540.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00541.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback