WV HB2556 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 57, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 57, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reset until 2014, the expiration date of provisions that allow the employment of retired teachers as substitutes beyond the post-retirement employment limit in areas of critical need and shortage. The bill also requires counties to report additional information on the number of these retired teachers and the critical need and shortage area positions filled by them to the Consolidated Public Retirement Board and state board and the dates of their notice of retirement and retirement. The state board is to include this information in its report to the Legislative Oversight Commission on Education Accountability.
Title
Resetting the expiration date of provisions that allow the employment of retired teachers as substitutes beyond the post-retirement employment limit
Sponsors
Del. Walter Duke [R] | Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. David Perry [D] |
Del. Mary Poling [D] | Del. William Romine [R] | Del. Stan Shaver [D] | Del. Josh Stowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-26 - House - Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-26 - House - Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 57, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | Approved by Governor 2/25/11 | |
2011-03-01 | Approved by Governor 02/25/11 - House Journal | |
2011-02-28 | Approved by Governor 02/25/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-02-28 | To Governor 02/25/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-02-25 | To Governor 2/25/11 - House Journal | |
2011-02-25 | To Governor 2/25/11 | |
2011-02-24 | House Message received | |
2011-02-23 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-02-23 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 125) | |
2011-02-23 | Passed House (Roll No. 124) | |
2011-02-23 | House concurred in Senate title amendment | |
2011-02-23 | House received Senate message | |
2011-02-22 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-02-22 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) | |
2011-02-22 | Title amendment adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2011-02-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-22 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-21 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-18 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-18 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-17 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2011-02-02 | To Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance | |
2011-01-27 | To Education | |
2011-01-27 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-27 | House Message received | |
2011-01-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-01-26 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) | |
2011-01-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 15) | |
2011-01-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-01-26 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-01-25 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-01-24 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-21 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-01-21 | Do pass | |
2011-01-19 | To House Education | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-19 | To Education then Finance | |
2011-01-19 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Similar To) 2011-02-18 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |