WV HB2554 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the transfer and enrollment policies for students in public schools.
Title
Relating to transfers and enrollment policies for students in public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 107) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 106) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 106) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 107) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 106) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 16a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |