WV HB2552 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the pet food registration fee and direct that the additional money to the West Virginia Spay Neuter Assistance Fund.
Title
Increasing the pet food registration fee and directing that the additional money be deposited into the West Virginia Spay Neuter Assistance Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 557) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 498) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 246) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 498) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 246) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-21 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 557) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 498) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/7/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-04-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 246) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed at foot of 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-16 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-20 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 14 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 14 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |