WV HB2548 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that the temporary identification cards issued upon release to an inmate are at no cost to the inmate and extend the validity of the temporary identification cards to 180 days.
Title
Relating to temporary identification cards for released inmates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 92) |
2023-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-07 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | House | To House Jails and Prisons |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-13 | House | To Jails and Prisons then Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 1c | Amended Code | Citation Text |