WV HB2546 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2546
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow uniform costs to be deducted from an employee’s final paycheck if the uniform is not returned.
Title
Allowing replacement costs of employer provided property to be deducted from an employee’s final paycheck if the property is not returned
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 119) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/18 |
2018-02-26 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/23/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-20 | House | To Governor 2/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/19/18 |
2018-02-15 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 119) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/13/18 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Workforce |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Workforce |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 27) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-26 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2546 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |