WV HB2545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt recipients of the distinguished Purple Heart medal from payment of the vehicle registration fee for West Virginia residents.
Title
Exempting recipients of the distinguished Purple Heart medal from payment of the vehicle registration fee
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Lisa Zukoff [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Andrew Robinson [D] |
Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] | Del. Phillip Diserio [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Rodney Pyles [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 104) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 104) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB450 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |