WV HB2542 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide more flexibility in human resources and personnel to institutions of higher education. The bill strikes language mandating a temporary salary schedule and redefines classified and nonclassified employees. It removes bumping rights based upon seniority. The bill gives WVU and MU the right to develop their own classification and compensation systems and gives other institutions the option to apply to the HEPC or CTCC for the same right. The bill enables WVU, MU and any other authorized institution to develop rules for classification, compensation and human resources. The mandate for a Vice Chancellor of Human Resources is removed, along with all references thereto. Obsolete provisions are eliminated.
Title
Relating to public higher education personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Shall the bill be laid over one day? (Roll No. 29) (Y: 37 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 23) (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 22) (Y: 43 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Shall the bill be laid over one day? (Roll No. 29) (Y: 37 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 23) (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 22) (Y: 43 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-23 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 |
2017-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/17/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/17 |
2017-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-15 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 113) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 30) |
2017-02-28 | House | Shall the bill be laid over one day? (Roll No. 29) |
2017-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 23) |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 22) |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2017-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | To House Education |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-20 | House | To Education |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 4 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 8 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 9 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9A | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 9B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |