WV HB2538 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide banking services for services provided under the West Virginia Medical Cannabis Act.
Title
Providing banking services for medical cannabis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 353) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 186) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 186) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 353) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 186) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 185) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |