WV HB2524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide authority for pharmacists to convert prescriptions authorizing refills under certain circumstances.
Title
Permitting a pharmacist to convert prescriptions authorizing refills under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] |
Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 659) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 435) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 66) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 435) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 66) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 659) |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 435) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 66) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 5 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |