WV HB2515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide single parents attempting to accomplish reentering the workforce, obtaining a degree, or securing workforce training with available resources that would facilitate that effort.
Title
Require agencies to develop and maintain an inventory of available services for single parents wanting to obtain degrees, secure training or reenter the workforce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 584) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/21/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 584) |
2023-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Workforce |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Workforce then Government Organization |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 165) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-20 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-01-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2023-01-12 | House | To House Workforce Development |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-12 | House | To Workforce Development then Government Organization |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21A | 10 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |