WV HB2505 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that members of DSRS, MPFRS and EMSRS first employed in covered employment shall participate in only one retirement system administered by CPRB in which the member has the earliest hire date; and to specify that members of PERS, State Police (Plan B) and TRS employed in an additional job in DSRS, MPFRS or EMSRS shall participate in and abide by the concurrent employment provisions of said system administered by CPRB.
Title
Relating to retirement system participation and concurrent employment provisions
Sponsors
Del. Denny Canterbury [R] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Michael Folk [R] | Del. Ron Walters [R] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. Brian Kurcaba [R] | Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 146) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 146) (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-02-23 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 147) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 146) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-06 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-29 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB305 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |