WV HB2505 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 29, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adding synthetic cannabinoids and hallucinogens and stimulants to the Schedule I list of controlled substances (K2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding synthetic cannabinoids and hallucinogens and stimulants to the Schedule I list of controlled substances (K2)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-12 - House - Effect 30 Days From Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - 30 Days From Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-04 Chapter 29, Acts, 2011
2011-04-05 Approved by Governor 4/5/11
2011-03-18 Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal
2011-03-18 Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal
2011-03-18 To Governor 3/21/11 - House Journal
2011-03-21 To Governor 3/21/11
2011-03-18 To Governor 3/21/11 - Senate Journal
2011-03-12 Completed legislative action
2011-03-12 House Message received
2011-03-12 Communicated to Senate
2011-03-12 Effective thirty days from passage (Roll No. 436)
2011-03-12 House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 435)
2011-03-12 House received Senate message
2011-03-10 Senate requests House to concur
2011-03-10 Effective 30 days from passage (Roll No. 37)
2011-03-10 Passed Senate (Roll No. 37)
2011-03-10 Read 3rd time
2011-03-10 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 36)
2011-03-10 On 3rd reading
2011-03-10 Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-03-10 Read 2nd time
2011-03-10 On 2nd reading
2011-03-09 Read 1st time
2011-03-09 Immediate consideration
2011-03-09 On 1st reading
2011-03-09 Reported do pass, with amendment
2011-02-03 To Judiciary
2011-02-03 Introduced in Senate
2011-02-03 House Message received
2011-02-02 Communicated to Senate
2011-02-02 Effective thirty days from passage (Roll No. 33)
2011-02-02 Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-02-02 Passed House (Roll No. 32)
2011-02-02 Read 3rd time
2011-02-02 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2011-02-01 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-02-01 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-02-01 Read 2nd time
2011-02-01 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2011-01-31 Read 1st time
2011-01-31 On 1st reading, House Calendar
2011-01-28 By substitute, do pass
2011-01-14 To House Judiciary
2011-01-14 Introduced in House
2011-01-14 To Judiciary
2011-01-14 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A1101Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2204Amended CodeCitation Text
60A4401Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2505&year=2011&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2505%20SUB.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=2505
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2505%20intr.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=2505
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2505%20ENG%20SUB.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=2505
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2505%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=2505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bulletin_Board/2011/RS/House/Votes/00032.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bulletin_Board/2011/RS/House/Votes/00033.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bulletin_Board/2011/RS/House/Votes/00435.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bulletin_Board/2011/RS/House/Votes/00436.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback