WV HB2503 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to amend certain procedures in child neglect or abuse cases. The bill requires a petition to include an accusatory statement; provides when a court may and may not appoint counsel; and it removes the provision permitting copetitioners each to have counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to court actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 735) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House reconsidered its action (Roll No. 734) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 731) (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 526) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 465) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 464) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25HouseTo Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 735)
2019-03-09HouseHouse reconsidered its action (Roll No. 734)
2019-03-09HouseHouse refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 731)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 526)
2019-03-09SenateSubstitute amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-09SenateSenate recedes from amendment
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenateTrump Title amendment adopted
2019-03-08SenateJudiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2019-03-08SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 465)
2019-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-08SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 464)
2019-03-08SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2019-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2019-02-01SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-01SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 57)
2019-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-17HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-17HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
494601Amended CodeCitation Text
494722Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2503&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2503%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2503
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2503%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2503
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2503%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2503
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00057.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0464.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0465.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0526.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00731.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00734.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00735.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback