WV HB2499 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 260, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to stimulate economic growth in manufacturing industries by amending the definition of manufacturing for purposes of special method for appraising qualified capital additions to manufacturing facilities for property tax purposes; by amending the formula for calculating credit allowed for manufacturing investment to include small arms ammunition manufacturing and small arms, ordinance and ordinance accessories manufacturing; by creating the West Virginia Tax Credit For Federal Excise Tax Imposed Upon Small Arms And Ammunition Manufacturers and providing for its administration and enforcement of the tax credit; and by exempting sales of small arms and small arms ammunition from state sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax reduction for arms and ammo manufacturing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 393) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 259) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 222) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 260, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-08HouseApproved by Governor 4/8/21
2021-04-08HouseApproved by Governor 4/8/21 - House Journal
2021-04-08SenateApproved by Governor 4/8/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-02HouseTo Governor 4/2/21
2021-04-05HouseTo Governor 4/2/21 - House Journal
2021-04-02SenateTo Governor 4/2/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-02SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-01HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-04-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 393)
2021-04-01HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-31SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-31SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 287)
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-30SenateFloor amendment rejected (Roll No. 259)
2021-03-30SenateCommittee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-30SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/29/21
2021-03-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-27SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-27SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-26SenateReported do pass, with amendments
2021-03-22SenateTo Finance
2021-03-22SenateTo Finance
2021-03-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 222)
2021-03-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-19HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-17HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-16HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-15HouseTo House Finance
2021-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-15HouseTo Finance
2021-02-15HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1113KK1New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK10New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK11New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK12New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK13New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK14New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK15New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK16New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK17New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK2New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK3New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK4New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK5New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK6New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK7New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK8New CodeSee Bill Text
1113KK9New CodeSee Bill Text
1113S4Amended CodeCitation Text
11159tNew CodeSee Bill Text
116F2Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2499&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2499%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2499
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2499%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2499
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2499%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2499
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2499%20S%20FIN%20AM%20_1%203-25.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2499%20SFA%20_1%20BALDWIN%203-29.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2499%20SFA%20_2%20BALDWIN%203-30.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=799593978
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-30-0259.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-31-0287.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00393.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback