WV HB2498 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require medication-assisted treatment programs to have written policies concerning community relations.
Title
To require medication-assisted treatment programs to have written policies concerning community relations
Sponsors
Del. Laura Kimble [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Chuck Horst [R] | Del. Todd Kirby [R] |
Del. Chris Pritt [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/20/23 |
2023-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-03 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5Y | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |