WV HB2497 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2497
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend or clarify protections under the state’s whistle-blower law.
Title
Relating to the whistle-blower law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 213) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 47) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 47) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-02-29 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/24/20 |
2020-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 213) |
2020-02-18 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 47) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2497 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6C | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6C | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6C | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |