WV HB2495 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the filing of asbestos and silica claims
Title
Relating to the filing of asbestos and silica claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | To Governor 4/7/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 189) |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB512 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7G | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |