WV HB2486 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to remove barriers to employment for individuals with criminal records who seek licensure or certification in an occupation governed by this article, with certain exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Using records of criminal conviction to disqualify a person from receiving a license for a profession or occupation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 541) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 698) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 434) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 215) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-22HouseTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 541)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 698)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 434)
2019-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-06SenateImmediate consideration
2019-03-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2019-02-21SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-21SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-20HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-20HousePassed House (Roll No. 215)
2019-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-20HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-19HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-18HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-15HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-17HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-17HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30122New CodeSee Bill Text
301010Amended CodeCitation Text
30108Amended CodeCitation Text
3013A12Amended CodeCitation Text
3013A9Amended CodeCitation Text
301411Amended CodeCitation Text
302010Amended CodeCitation Text
30208Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A5Amended CodeCitation Text
30217Amended CodeCitation Text
302210Amended CodeCitation Text
302315Amended CodeCitation Text
302317Amended CodeCitation Text
302320Amended CodeCitation Text
30239Amended CodeCitation Text
30258Amended CodeCitation Text
302613Amended CodeCitation Text
30265Amended CodeCitation Text
303010Amended CodeCitation Text
303012Amended CodeCitation Text
303014Amended CodeCitation Text
303026Amended CodeCitation Text
30308Amended CodeCitation Text
30318Amended CodeCitation Text
30319Amended CodeCitation Text
303812Amended CodeCitation Text
30396Amended CodeCitation Text
30511Amended CodeCitation Text
30511aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2486&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2486%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2486
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2486%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2486
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2486%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2486
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2486%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2486
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00215.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0434.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00698.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0541.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback