WV HB2478 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2478
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the Fair Trade Practices Act with regard to costs and damages.
Title
Modifying the Fair Trade Practices Act
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 64) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2478 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 11A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 11A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |