WV HB2478 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise certain aspects of public school finance and the school aid formula. First, it eliminates the authority of growth county boards of education to designate regular school board levy revenues due to new construction or improvements to a Growth County School Facilities Act Fund. Second, it authorizes propane as an eligible fuel for the ten percent additional percentage allowance for school bus systems using alternative fuels. Third, it extends the bus replacement cycle from twelve to fifteen years. Fourth, it eliminates certain adjustments in the basic foundation program.
Title
Relating to public school finance
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 47) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 595) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 594) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 15) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 14) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 245) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 244) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 230) (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 595) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 594) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 15) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 14) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 245) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 244) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 230) (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-31 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 |
2015-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 47) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 595) |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 594) |
2015-03-14 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-14 | House | House further considered bill |
2015-03-14 | House | Postponed Consideration |
2015-03-14 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-14 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 15) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Finance Title amendment adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Education Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 14) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Education |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-28 | House | Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 245) |
2015-02-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 244) |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 230) |
2015-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | To House Education |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-28 | House | To Education then Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Same As) 2015-01-23 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 8 | 6f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |