WV HB2474 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the State Board of Education to establish salary schedules or additional compensation for teachers whose job duties require specialized training and skills or assignments in addition to regular instructional duties.
Title
Relating to the compensation of personnel employed at the West Virginia Schools for the Deaf and the Blind
Sponsors
Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Walter Duke [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 271) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 271) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | To House Education |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-28 | House | To Education then Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 17 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |