WV HB2471 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to ensure that persons setting up a payment plan make payments on that plan or else their licenses will be suspended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the suspension of driver’s license for unpaid tickets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-11HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2023-02-15HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-15HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-14HouseImmediate consideration
2023-02-14HouseBy substitute, do pass
2023-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-06HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2023-01-11HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced in House
2023-01-11HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2023-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8102bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback