WV HB2459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exercise authority to exempt individuals domiciled within the state from certain restrictions contained in federal law.Â
Title
Exercising authority to exempt individuals domiciled within the state from certain restrictions contained in federal law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 214) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 122) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 21) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 122) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 21) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-28 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Governor 2/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/19 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 214) |
2019-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 122) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 21) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |