WV HB2452 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the establishment of a cybersecurity framework for state agencies. The framework will be developed and administered by the Chief Information Security Officer within the Office of Technology. The bill creates a minimum standard for cybersecurity controls for state agencies. The bill requires cybersecurity assessments to determine the status of state agencies with respect to cybersecurity. The bill provides exceptions from application and from disclosure of certain information. The bill repeals ยง5A-6-4a.
Title
Creating the West Virginia Cybersecurity Office
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 395) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 282) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 282) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 395) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 282) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-30 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 6 | 4a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 6B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 6B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 6B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 6B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 6B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |