WV HB2446 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 230, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 230, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the Blue Alert program which will aid in locating a law-enforcement officer who has disappeared in the line of duty or locating and safely apprehending a suspect or suspects who kill or inflict a life-threatening injury upon a law-enforcement officer and remain at large.
Title
Blue Alert Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 134) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 25) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 25) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 230, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 134) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 25) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |