WV HB2435 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - House rejected (Roll No. 24)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - House rejected (Roll No. 24)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize and empower the Attorney General to prosecute violations of state criminal law recommended by the Commission on Special Investigations under certain conditions; to provide that CSI recommend prosecution of state criminal law violations to appropriate county prosecutor; to provide that, if county prosecutor has not pursued the matter within six months, CSI must recommend the matter to the Attorney General; empowering and authorizing the Attorney General to prosecute violations of state criminal law referred by CSI under certain conditions; and empower the Attorney General to impanel a grand jury and prosecute a person indicted by that grand jury.Â
Title
Authorizing Attorney General to prosecute violations of state criminal law recommended by the Commission on Special Investigations
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 24) (Y: 45 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 24) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |