WV HB2383 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the Redistricting Office of the Joint Committee on Government and Finance to propose redistricting plans during census years. The main task of the Redistricting Office is to propose a plan to the Legislature which is based on Constitutional and legal requirements and considerations. The bill provides specific criteria that the redistricting office must observe in proposing district mappings. The bill requires the redistricting office to advertise a proposed draft map of districts to the public. The bill requires the redistricting office to recommend redistricting plan to the Legislature. The bill requires the full Legislature to vote on plan ratification. The bill provides for subsequent submissions of plans and vote by Legislature. The bill requires that the commission certify to the Secretary of State that its final proposal for district boundaries is in accordance with Constitutional and legal requirements. The bill prohibits certain persons from influencing or attempting to influence district mapping proposals of the redistricting office.
Title
Providing for the redistricting office of the Joint Committee on Government and Finance to propose redistricting plans during census years
Sponsors
Del. John Overington [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2018-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2383 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - To House Judiciary