WV HB2382 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to promulgate a legislative rule relating to ambient air quality standards
Title
Authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to promulgate a legislative rule relating to ambient air quality standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 206) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 205) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 136) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 130) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 205) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 136) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 130) (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-08 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-26 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 206) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 205) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 136) |
2021-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 135) |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 130) |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary on 1st reading |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB130 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |