WV HB2368 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 144, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 144, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the board of Barbers and Cosmetologists to create a barber's apprentice program. The board may also license an applicant from another jurisdiction who completed an apprentice program.
Title
Relating to the practice of beauty care
Sponsors
Del. Jim Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-09 - House - Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-09 - House - Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 144, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/21/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/21/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/11 | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 394) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 393) | |
2011-03-12 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-12 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2011-03-12 | On Unfinished Business, House Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Laid over on Unfinished Business, House Calendar, until 3/12/11 | |
2011-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-09 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2011-02-10 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-10 | House Message received | |
2011-02-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 63) | |
2011-02-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 62) | |
2011-02-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-09 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-08 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-07 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-12 | To House Government Organization | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-12 | To Government Organization | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 27 | 11a | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 27 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |