WV HB2367 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a new crime of organized retail crime, establishing penalties; and providing for forfeiture of property or other asset derived from organized retail crime.
Title
Establishing a criminal offense of organized retail crime
Sponsors
Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] |
Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 372) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 372) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 524) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 372) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 63) |
2017-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-02 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 3F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 3F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 3F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |