WV HB2363 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The Best Interests of the Child Protection Act of 2021. The purpose of this bill is to establish that co-equal shared legal and physical custody of a child, and the maintaining of sibling, including half-sibling, relationships through co-equal shared legal and physical custody of children, in cases of divorce is presumed to be in the best interests of the child; that parental rights are protected constitutional rights of parents that may not be infringed upon by courts except after full adversarial judicial proceedings on the record and with no consideration of ex parte evidence of any kind by any court or judge against any parent; and also that certain parental rights are coordinate with and directly justify the granting shared legal and physical custody equally between parents of children and shall be so enforced by the courts of this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to “Best Interests of the Child Protection Act of 2021”

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 495) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 667) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House refused to recede (Roll No. 666) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 665) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 617) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 455) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 97) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-28HouseApproved by Governor 4/28/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-22HouseTo Governor 4/22/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal
2021-04-11SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-11SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 495)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10HouseMotion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 667)
2021-04-10HouseHouse refused to recede (Roll No. 666)
2021-04-10HouseMotion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 665)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-10SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 617)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-10SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 455)
2021-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-04-09SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-08SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-08SenateImmediate consideration
2021-04-08SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2021-03-09SenateTo Judiciary
2021-03-09SenateTo Judiciary
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 97)
2021-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-08HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-08HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2021-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-08HousePlaced on Special Calender
2021-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2021-03-04HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-03HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-03HousePlaced on Special Calender
2021-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2021-03-01HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-26HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/1/21
2021-02-26HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-25HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-24HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-13HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-13HouseTo Judiciary
2021-02-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
481220Amended CodeCitation Text
481239Amended CodeCitation Text
481239aNew CodeSee Bill Text
481239bNew CodeSee Bill Text
481241aNew CodeSee Bill Text
481241bNew CodeSee Bill Text
489102Amended CodeCitation Text
489105New CodeSee Bill Text
489203Amended CodeCitation Text
489204Amended CodeCitation Text
489206Amended CodeCitation Text
489207Amended CodeCitation Text
489209Amended CodeCitation Text
489301Amended CodeCitation Text
489403Amended CodeCitation Text
489601Amended CodeCitation Text
489603Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2363&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2363%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2363
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2363%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2363
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2363%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2363
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2363%20SUB%20ENG2.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2363
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2363%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2363
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20HFA%20FOSTER%202-25%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20HFA%20FAST%202-25%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20HFA%20KIMBLE%202-25%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20HFA%20FOSTER%20AND%20KIMBLE%202-26%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20HFA%20FOSTER%203-5%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2363%20FOSTER%20AMT%203-5%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2363%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-7.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2363%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20SUB1%20HFA%20FOSTER%204-10%20_1%20AMENDED%20adopted%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2363%20SUB1%20HFA%20FOSTER%204-10%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2363%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-7%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2363%20CAPITO%20AMT%20_1%204-10.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00097.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0455.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00617.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00665.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00666.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00667.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0495.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback