WV HB2363 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enhance and extend the Upper Kanawha Valley Resiliency and Revitalization Program.
Title
Relating to the Upper Kanawha Valley Resiliency and Revitalization Program
Sponsors
Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. Michael Angelucci [D] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Del. Andrew Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 561) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 84) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 84) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/2719 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 561) |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Gov Org Title amendment adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Education Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Education then Government Organization |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 84) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/5/19 |
2019-02-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Education |
2019-01-25 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Education |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Government Organization then Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |