WV HB2363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2363
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that a state employee with a commercial driver’s license have a current medical evaluation certification and may not have a medical waiver.
Title
Requiring that a state employee with a commercial driver’s license have a current medical evaluation certification
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. Ricky Moye [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-30 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 254) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-13 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2363 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17E | 1 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17E | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |