WV HB2359 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the meaning of “federal taxable income” and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Corporation Net Income Tax Act by bringing them into conformity with their meaning for Internal Revenue Code’s definitions; and specifying effective dates.
Title
Updating the meaning of federal taxable income and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Corporation Net Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 6) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 6) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 |
2021-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/21 - House Journal |
2021-02-23 | House | To Governor 2/23/21 |
2021-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/23/21 - House Journal |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/23/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 13) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 12) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 6) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-15 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB271 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 24 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |