WV HB2351 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulating prior authorizations
Title
Relating to regulating prior authorizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 169) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 203) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 202) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 72) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 41) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 2) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 169) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 203) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 202) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 72) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 41) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 2) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 169) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 203) |
2019-02-19 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 202) |
2019-02-19 | House | Conference report received-House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2019-02-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To conference |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Maroney, Takubo, Stollings |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | House appointed conferees: Ellington, Hollen, Staggers |
2019-02-11 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2019-02-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 72) |
2019-02-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 41) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 2) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-11 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-11 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4s | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3dd | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7s | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8p | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8s | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7f | New Code | See Bill Text |