WV HB2346 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require the Commissioner of the Division of Motor Vehicles to conduct a study on the cost effectiveness of flat license plates. The bill requires the commissioner to issue those types of plates if the study determines flat license plates are cost effective.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle license plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 170) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2017-03-27SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2017-03-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-03-27SenateHouse Message received
2017-03-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-03-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 170)
2017-03-25HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-23HouseRead 1st time
2017-03-23HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2017-03-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2017-03-01HouseTo House Government Organization
2017-03-01HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2017-02-13HouseTo House Roads and Transportation
2017-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-13HouseTo Roads and Transportation then Government Organization
2017-02-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17A225New CodeSee Bill Text
17A314aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback