WV HB2330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2330
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - On 2nd reading to Government Organization
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - On 2nd reading to Government Organization
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow honorably discharged veterans who possess certain military ratings to qualify to take an examination for licensing as a plumber, electrician, and sprinkler fitter.
Title
Allowing honorably discharged veterans who possess certain military ratings to qualify to take an examination for licensing as a plumber, electrician, and sprinkler fitter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 123) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Military then Government Organization |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 123) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-23 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-11 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - On 2nd reading to Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 14 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3B | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3D | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |