WV HB2319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require members of the Legislature to disclose contributions and fund-raising events while the Legislature is in session. The bill requires the information to be provided within 5 days of the event or receipt of contribution, and requires the Secretary of State to publish such information on the Secretary of State’s website within 1 day.
Title
Relating to candidates or candidate committees for legislative office disclosing contributions
Sponsors
Del. Jill Upson [R] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 396) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 371) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 371) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/17/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/17/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/17/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 396) |
2017-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 371) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment not germane |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Floor amendment reported |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2017-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 4) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary