WV HB2301 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit individuals to enter into agreements, for direct primary care with an individual or other legal entity authorized to provide primary care services, outside of an insurance plan or outside of the Medicaid or Medicare program and pay for the care. The bill provides that a direct primary care membership agreement is not considered insurance and that a direct primary care provider is not required to obtain certain credentials or licensing. The bill prohibits the billing of third party providers for direct primary care services. It details requirements for a direct primary care membership agreement. The bill permits rule-making authority by the West Virginia Board of Medicine; the West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine and the West Virginia Board of Examiners for Registered Professional Nurses to effectuate the provisions of this new article. And the bill authorizes civil penalties in the form of sanctions by the respective boards for violations that constitute unprofessional conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to direct primary care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 90) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 97) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 9) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseChapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
2017-03-24SenateApproved by Governor 3/23/17 - Senate Journal
2017-03-23HouseApproved by Governor 3/23/17
2017-03-24HouseApproved by Governor 3/23/17 - House Journal
2017-03-20HouseTo Governor 3/17/17 - House Journal
2017-03-17HouseTo Governor 3/17/17
2017-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/17/17 - Senate Journal
2017-03-16SenateHouse Message received
2017-03-15HouseCompleted legislative action
2017-03-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-03-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 90)
2017-03-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate title amendment
2017-03-15HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-03-11SenateSenate requests House to concur
2017-03-11SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 97)
2017-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-10SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-09SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-09SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-08SenateReported do pass, with title amendment
2017-02-23SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2017-02-23SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-23SenateHouse Message received
2017-02-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-02-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 9)
2017-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-02-22HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2017-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2017-02-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2017-02-13HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-02-13HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-09HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162J1Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J2Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J3Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J4Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J5Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J6Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J7Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J8Repealed CodeCitation Text
162J9Repealed CodeCitation Text
303F1New CodeSee Bill Text
303F2New CodeSee Bill Text
303F3New CodeSee Bill Text
303F4New CodeSee Bill Text
303F5New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2301&year=2017&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2301%20intr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2301
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2301%20SUB.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2301
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2301%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2301
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2301%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=2301
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/senate/03-11-0097.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00090.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback